OR HB2455 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires use of taxpayer's audience or subscribers in determining numerator of apportionment factor for broadcasting sales, for purposes of corporate excise taxation. Requires use of taxpayer's audience or subscribers in determining numerator of apportionment factor for broadcasting sales, for purposes of corporate excise taxation. Establishes requirements for calculating audience- or subscriber-based numerator. Provides percentage-based apportionment formula for receipts related to subscription services. Allows election to use methodology based on audience or subscribers for total gross receipts of taxpayer engaged in broadcasting. Repeals special apportionment statutes applicable to income of interstate broadcasters, for purposes of corporate excise taxation. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2020. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to tax treatment of broadcasters; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-02-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2455 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2455/Introduced |