OR HB2454 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends sunset of homestead property tax deferral program for certain seniors and persons with disabilities. Extends sunset of homestead property tax deferral program for certain seniors and persons with disabilities. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to the homestead property tax deferral program; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Revenue by prior reference (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-08 | House | Referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2021-04-08 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2021-04-05 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Human Services with subsequent referral to Revenue. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |