OR HB2453 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Public Hearing held.
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Oregon Business Development Department to develop workforce development plan to communicate advantages of Eastern Oregon Border Economic Development Region in order to encourage people to move to and work in region. Requires department to submit workforce development plan to interim legislative committees related to economic development on or before September 15, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to workforce development plan for the Eastern Oregon Border Economic Development Region.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-01-18HouseReferred to Economic Development with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback