OR HB2451 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes medical assistance eligibility for individuals under age 26 who have aged out of foster care in Oregon or another state. Requires Oregon Health Authority to seek federal matching funds for costs of medical assistance provided to individuals who aged out of foster care in another state.
Title
Relating to foster children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-04-11 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-04-11 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-04-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-02-27 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |