OR HB2449 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Extends sunset for tax credit for biomass collection or production. Provides that credit is allowed for delivery of biomass to biofuel producer. Adjusts credit rates to reflect current market conditions and energy content of types of biomass. Authorizes State Department of Energy to adjust credit rates annually. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2016. Creates tax credit for energy production by certain bioenergy facilities. Directs State Department of Energy to establish pilot program intended to facilitate transition to tax incentives allowed per unit of energy production from current system of incentives allowed per unit of biomass feedstock and to provide for evaluation of effectiveness of energy production-based incentives, including income tax credits, for certain bioenergy facilities. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2016, and before January 1, 2022, and to energy production occurring on or after January 1, 2016, and before January 1, 2022. Sunsets pilot program on January 2, 2022. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to tax credits for bioenergy; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-04-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments, be printed engrossed and be referred to Revenue by prior reference (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-04-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-04-13 | House | Referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2015-04-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2015-04-09 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-03-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment with subsequent referral to Revenue. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |