OR HB2449 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes strikes or recognition of picket line of labor organization by assistant attorneys general unlawful.
Title
Relating to assistant attorneys general.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Rules by order of the President. |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Rules. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-03-21 | House | Third reading. Carried by Matthews. Passed. Ayes, 39; Nays, 18--Bentz, Berger, Cameron, Conger, Davis, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hicks, Huffman, Krieger, McLane, Olson, Parrish, Richardson, Sprenger, Whisnant, Whitsett; Excused, 2--Hanna, Smith; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Dembrow. |
2013-03-20 | House | Second reading. |
2013-03-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-03-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-02-22 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |