OR HB2445 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Chapter 203, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Chapter 203, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows Director of Agriculture and State Department of Agriculture to choose methods for giving notice regarding quarantines, control areas and related rules in addition to notice by publication in newspaper. Allows Director of Agriculture and State Department of Agriculture to choose methods for giving notice regarding quarantines, control areas and related rules in addition to notice by publication in newspaper. Eliminates requirement that department declare hazard and establish control area in response to existence of eastern filbert blight. Eliminates references to Grade B milk. Allows director to choose method for making noxious weed information available. Expands applicability of defined terms for statutes dealing with plant pests and plant infections and infestations. Amends definition of "certificate of analysis" in biodiesel laws. Eliminates requirement that department give fuel dealers notice of threshold biodiesel production capacity. Repeals requirement that department study and monitor ethanol production. Repeals obsolete statutes providing for participation in former Interstate Compact on Pest Control.
Title
Relating to programs administered by the State Department of Agriculture.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-05-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-05 | House | Chapter 203, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016. |
2015-06-02 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-05-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Olsen. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Burdick. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2015-03-09 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-03-05 | House | Third reading. Carried by Witt. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Taylor. |
2015-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 5, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 4, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-03-02 | House | Second reading. |
2015-02-27 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2015-02-24 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-02-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-02-10 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Rural Communities, Land Use and Water. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |