OR HB2430 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires all information provided as part of candidate's statement for voters' pamphlet to be true. Punishes violation by maximum of five years' imprisonment, $125,000 fine, or both.
Title
Relating to voters' pamphlet statements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-29 - House - House Withdraw from Committee (Y: 24 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-06-29 | House | Motion to withdraw from Rules failed.Ayes, 24; Nays, 33--Alonso Leon, Barnhart, Boone, Bynum, Clem, Doherty, Evans, Fahey, Gomberg, Gorsek, Greenlick, Helm, Hernandez, Holvey, Keny-Guyer, Lininger, Lively, Malstrom, Marsh, McKeown, McLain, Meek, Nosse, Piluso, Power, Rayfield, Reardon, Sanchez, Smith Warner, Sollman, Williamson, Witt, Speaker Kotek; Absent, 1--Barker; Excused, 1--Buehler; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Nathanson. |
2017-03-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |