OR HB2429 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions of corporate activity tax. Modifies provisions of corporate activity tax. Expands exemption for grocery sales to include groceries held by consignee store operator. Expands exemption for motor vehicle dealer transactions to include all new vehicle exchanges between franchised motor vehicle dealerships. Expands exception allowing vehicle dealer to collect estimated portion of tax from purchaser to include collection from lessee. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2022. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to corporate activity tax; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2429 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2429/Introduced |