OR HB2428 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Chapter 65, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Chapter 65, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that masturbation while in, or in view of, public place constitutes crime of public indecency. Punishes by maximum of 364 days' imprisonment, $6,250 fine, or both. Punishes by maximum of five years' imprisonment, $125,000 fine, or both, if person has specified prior conviction. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to public indecency; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Chapter 65, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die. |
2019-05-06 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Winters. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Carried over to 04-25 by unanimous consent. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-03-28 | House | Third reading. Carried by Lewis. Passed. Ayes, 55; Nays, 3--Greenlick, Lively, Smith Warner; Excused, 2--Findley, Keny-Guyer. |
2019-03-27 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 28, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-03-26 | House | Second reading. |
2019-03-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-03-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |