OR HB2427 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-14 - Chapter 724, (2013 Laws): Effective date August 14, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-14 - Chapter 724, (2013 Laws): Effective date August 14, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Defines Willamette Valley Protected District.
Title
Relating to canola; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Gelser Blouin [D] | Rep. Val Hoyle [D] | Sen. Chris Edwards [D] | Rep. Philip Barnhart [D] |
Rep. Paul Holvey [D] | Rep. Nancy Nathanson [D] | Rep. Carolyn Tomei [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-14 | House | Chapter 724, (2013 Laws): Effective date August 14, 2013. |
2013-08-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-07-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Edwards. Passed. Ayes, 18; nays, 12--Baertschiger, Beyer, Boquist, Close, Ferrioli, George, Girod, Hansell, Johnson, Knopp, Kruse, Thomsen. |
2013-06-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-06-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-06-25 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 37; Nays, 22--Bentz, Berger, Cameron, Clem, Conger, Davis, Esquivel, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Huffman, Johnson, Komp, Krieger, McLane, Parrish, Richardson, Smith, Sprenger, Thompson, Weidner, Whisnant; Excused, 1--Unger. |
2013-06-24 | House | Second reading. |
2013-06-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2013-06-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-18 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-06-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-05-16 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-30 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2013-04-22 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2013-04-22 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-04-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-03-19 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |