OR HB2426 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-18 - Work Session held.
Pending: House Veterans and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Oregon Homeland Security Council to develop updated list of equipment for purposes of emergency preparedness equipment grant program. Directs Oregon Homeland Security Council to develop updated list of equipment for purposes of emergency preparedness equipment grant program. Directs council to prioritize preparedness equipment necessary for urban search and rescue teams. Directs Office of Emergency Management to prioritize grant requests from certain applicants for urban search and rescue purposes. Authorizes issuance of general obligation bonds under Article XI-Q of Oregon Constitution for grant program. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to emergency preparedness; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-18HouseWork Session held.
2021-02-04HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Veterans and Emergency Management with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback