OR HB2426 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Chapter 45, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Chapter 45, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Permits credit unions to prescribe terms of executive officers in bylaws. Changes threshold date to January 1, 2019, from January 1, 2017, for exercise by state credit unions of powers available to federal credit unions without Director of Department of Consumer and Business Services approval. Modifies laws relating to meetings of members of credit unions.
Title
Relating to credit unions.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | House | Chapter 45, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-05-01 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Olsen. Passed. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Hansell, Linthicum, Winters. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Carried over to 04-22 by unanimous consent. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Business and General Government. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-02-07 | House | Third reading. Carried by Boshart Davis. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Clem, Smith G. |
2019-02-06 | House | Second reading. |
2019-02-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-02-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-01-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |