OR HB2424 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Human Services, in consultation with Oregon Youth Authority and Oregon Health Authority, to develop child-caring agency grant and training program. Directs Department of Human Services, in consultation with Oregon Youth Authority and Oregon Health Authority, to develop child-caring agency grant and training program. Appropriates moneys to department for program. Modifies unsubstantiated abuse reports involving child-caring agencies to include situations in which there is evidence that abuse of child in care occurred but that abuse was result of substandard care.] Establishes Child Welfare Cultural Equity Program within Department of Human Services to ensure access to diverse set of child welfare service providers consistent with cultural diversity needs of population being served. Appropriates moneys to department for program. Creates qualified mental health associate incentive program within Oregon Health Authority. Appropriates moneys to authority for program. Prescribes certain educational and training requirements for qualified mental health associates assisting child-caring agencies. Appropriates moneys to Oregon Health Authority.
Title
Relating to child welfare.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-06 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-04-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-03-31 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Human Services with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |