OR HB2423 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Chapter 401, (2019 Laws): Effective date October 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Chapter 401, (2019 Laws): Effective date October 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Adopts Small Home Specialty Code to regulate construction of homes not more than 400 square feet in size. Requires amendment of Low-Rise Residential Dwelling Code to provide that Small Home Specialty Code supersedes conflicting provisions of Low-Rise Residential Dwelling Code. Authorizes municipal building official to alter, modify or waive specialty code requirements for small home if strict adherence to Small Home Specialty Code is impractical or infeasible. Requires that building permits and zoning permits for small home designate small home as single family project. Requires that certificate of occupancy for small home allow occupancy only for residential use as single family dwelling. Specifies application of fire sprinkler head and fire sprinkler system design criteria to small homes. Authorizes municipal building official to allow increased detection and occupant notification in lieu of fire sprinkler head or fire sprinkler system. Requires that small home be built with listed heat detector unit alarm or] listed photoelectric smoke alarm. Sunsets Small Home Specialty Code and small home fire sprinkler design , heat detector] and smoke alarm provisions on January 2, 2026. Takes effect October 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to small homes; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-21 | House | Chapter 401, (2019 Laws): Effective date October 1, 2019. |
2019-06-17 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-05 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 57; Nays, 2--Boshart Davis, Wallan; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Rayfield. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hass. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Carried over to 05-22 by unanimous consent. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Business and General Government. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-23 | House | Third reading. Carried by Holvey. Passed. Ayes, 56; Nays, 2--Boshart Davis, Wallan; Excused, 1--Marsh; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2019-04-22 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 23, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-04-18 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-04-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |