OR HB2423 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-08 - Chapter 625, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-08 - Chapter 625, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that inmates convicted of certain crimes are not eligible for earned time reduction in prison sentence. Eliminates certain earned time reductions available for completion of education program. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to earned time sentence reductions; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-08 | House | Chapter 625, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2015. |
2015-07-01 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-06-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-06-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Shields. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Bates. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety. |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-04-15 | House | Third reading. Carried by Barton. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Gorsek. |
2015-04-14 | House | Second reading. |
2015-04-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-04-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-03-12 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |