OR HB2421 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-25 - Chapter 647, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 25, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-25 - Chapter 647, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 25, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Director of Transportation to notify Director of Veterans' Affairs upon receipt of certain written information from member or veteran of uniformed service, if authorized to do so by member or veteran.
Title
Relating to communication between state agencies regarding members of uniformed services; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Matthews [D] | Rep. Brian Clem [D] | Sen. Lew Frederick [D] | Rep. Julie Parrish [R] |
Sen. Arnie Roblan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-25 | House | Chapter 647, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 25, 2013. |
2013-07-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-07-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-07-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed. Ayes, 30. |
2013-07-06 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-07-06 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-07-03 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Jenson. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 2--Krieger, Weidner; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Barnhart, Buckley, Speaker Kotek. |
2013-07-03 | House | Second reading. |
2013-07-03 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2013-07-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-26 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-06-26 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-05-23 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-05-08 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2013-02-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-02-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-02-19 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-02-12 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to Veterans' Services and Emergency Preparedness. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |