OR HB2418 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies certain presumptions as to cause of death, disability or impairment of health of fire service professional, public safety personnel or employee of public or private safety agency with duties related to firefighting, police, ambulance or emergency medical services in claim for benefits related to occupational disease under workers' compensation law.
Title
Relating to occupational diseases for purposes of workers' compensation for certain workers.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules by order of Speaker. |
2019-04-15 | House | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules. |
2019-04-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |