OR HB2417 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 617, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 27, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 617, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 27, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expands crisis stabilization services, including crisis stabilization centers meeting criteria adopted by Oregon Health Authority by rule, short-term respite facilities, peer respite centers, behavioral health urgent care walk-in centers and crisis hotline center. Requires Oregon Health Authority to provide grants to cities or funding to county community mental health programs to operate mobile crisis intervention teams and provide other behavioral health supports.] Directs authority to convene work group to study and evaluate methods for continuing to fund mobile crisis intervention teams and other behavioral health supports.] Expands crisis stabilization services, including crisis stabilization centers meeting criteria adopted by Oregon Health Authority by rule, short-term respite facilities, peer respite centers, behavioral health urgent care walk-in centers and crisis hotline center. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to authority to provide funding to county community mental health programs to establish and maintain mobile crisis intervention teams. Requires authority, no later than January 1, 2022, to report to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to mental or behavioral health, recommendations on policies and legislative changes, if any, needed to implement National Suicide Hotline Designation Act of 2020 and establish statewide coordinated crisis services system. Specifies information that must be included in report. Limits liability of 9-8-8 coordinated crisis services system to conduct that is willful or wanton. Prohibits blocking delivery or forwarding to public safety answering point of 9-8-8 coordinated crisis services system information. Makes number identifications and subscriber information received by 9-8-8 coordinated crisis services system confidential and not subject to public disclosure unless specified criteria are met. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2021.
Title
Relating to crisis intervention resources; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage, be referred to Behavioral Health, and then to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage, be referred to Behavioral Health, and then to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 617, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 27, 2021. |
2021-07-27 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 6--Findley, Girod, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Absent, 1--Boquist; Excused, 2--Heard, Manning Jr. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-06-24 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Sanchez. Passed. Ayes, 40; Nays, 17--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Hayden, Leif, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Weber; Excused, 2--Bynum, Smith G. |
2021-06-24 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2021-06-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-17 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-13 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2021-04-06 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-04-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-04-05 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-24 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to Behavioral Health by order of Speaker and then Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-01-29 | House | Without recommendation as to passage, be referred to Behavioral Health, and then to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-01-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |