OR HB2417 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 617, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 27, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Expands crisis stabilization services, including crisis stabilization centers meeting criteria adopted by Oregon Health Authority by rule, short-term respite facilities, peer respite centers, behavioral health urgent care walk-in centers and crisis hotline center. Requires Oregon Health Authority to provide grants to cities or funding to county community mental health programs to operate mobile crisis intervention teams and provide other behavioral health supports.] Directs authority to convene work group to study and evaluate methods for continuing to fund mobile crisis intervention teams and other behavioral health supports.] Expands crisis stabilization services, including crisis stabilization centers meeting criteria adopted by Oregon Health Authority by rule, short-term respite facilities, peer respite centers, behavioral health urgent care walk-in centers and crisis hotline center. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to authority to provide funding to county community mental health programs to establish and maintain mobile crisis intervention teams. Requires authority, no later than January 1, 2022, to report to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to mental or behavioral health, recommendations on policies and legislative changes, if any, needed to implement National Suicide Hotline Designation Act of 2020 and establish statewide coordinated crisis services system. Specifies information that must be included in report. Limits liability of 9-8-8 coordinated crisis services system to conduct that is willful or wanton. Prohibits blocking delivery or forwarding to public safety answering point of 9-8-8 coordinated crisis services system information. Makes number identifications and subscriber information received by 9-8-8 coordinated crisis services system confidential and not subject to public disclosure unless specified criteria are met. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to crisis intervention resources; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage, be referred to Behavioral Health, and then to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-25HouseChapter 617, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 27, 2021.
2021-07-27HouseGovernor signed.
2021-06-30SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-29HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-26SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 6--Findley, Girod, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Absent, 1--Boquist; Excused, 2--Heard, Manning Jr.
2021-06-26SenateSecond reading.
2021-06-26SenateRecommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
2021-06-25SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2021-06-25SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2021-06-24HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Sanchez. Passed. Ayes, 40; Nays, 17--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Hayden, Leif, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Weber; Excused, 2--Bynum, Smith G.
2021-06-24HouseSecond reading.
2021-06-23HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2021-06-21HouseWork Session held.
2021-06-17HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2021-06-17HouseWork Session held.
2021-06-13HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
2021-04-06HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2021-04-06HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2021-04-05HouseWork Session held.
2021-02-24HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-29HouseReferred to Behavioral Health by order of Speaker and then Ways and Means by prior reference.
2021-01-29HouseWithout recommendation as to passage, be referred to Behavioral Health, and then to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2021-01-28HouseWork Session held.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2417
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2417/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2417/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2417/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2417/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2417/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2417/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/31073
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/31753
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/33101
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=533731
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=534655

Bill Comments

feedback