OR HB2416 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires person applying for issuance or renewal of recreational vehicle registration for small home to attest home meets certain conditions concerning mobility. Makes false attestation subject to maximum penalty of 364 days' incarceration, $6,250 fine, or both. Requires Department of Transportation to revoke registration of small home if department discovers home no longer meets certain conditions concerning mobility. Makes small home constructed on wheeled chassis subject to state building code under certain conditions concerning lack of mobility.
Title
Relating to small homes.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB2416 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2416/Introduced |