OR HB2408 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enacts interstate Nurse Licensure Compact. Enacts interstate Nurse Licensure Compact. Permits Oregon State Board of Nursing to disclose specified information to Interstate Commission of Nurse Licensure Compact Administrators. Exempts individuals authorized to work as nurses under multistate licensure privilege from requirement to obtain license from board and from restrictions on use of titles. Allows board to use moneys to meet financial obligations imposed on State of Oregon as result of participation in compact. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to a nurse licensure compact; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-17 - House - House Withdraw from Committee (Y: 28 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-09 - House - House Withdraw from Committee (Y: 30 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - House Withdraw from Committee (Y: 30 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-05-17 | House | Motion to withdraw from Behavioral Health and Health Care failed. Ayes, 28; Nays, 32--Andersen, Bowman, Bynum, Chaichi, Dexter, Evans, Fahey, Gamba, Grayber, Helm, Holvey, Hudson, Kropf, Lively, Marsh, McLain, Nathanson, Nelson, Neron, Nguyen D, Nguyen H, Nosse, Pham H, Pham K, Reynolds, Ruiz, Sanchez, Sosa, Tran, Valderrama, Walters, Speaker Rayfield. |
2023-05-09 | House | Motion to withdraw from Behavioral Health and Health Care failed. Ayes, 30; Nays, 29--Andersen, Bowman, Chaichi, Dexter, Fahey, Gamba, Grayber, Helm, Holvey, Hudson, Kropf, Lively, Marsh, McLain, Nathanson, Nelson, Nguyen D, Nguyen H, Nosse, Pham H, Pham K, Reynolds, Ruiz, Sanchez, Sosa, Tran, Valderrama, Walters, Speaker Rayfield; Excused, 1--Bynum. |
2023-02-20 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-11 | House | Referred to Behavioral Health and Health Care. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |