OR HB2404 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Oregon Health Authority to analyze ground water contaminant data and provide education in areas with ground water contaminant problems. Authorizes authority to make grants and loans for purpose of assisting rental property owners and low-income property owners with installation of treatment systems. Authorizes authority to make grants to local public health authorities and other specified entities for purposes related to ensuring safe ground water. Establishes Safe Ground Water Fund and continuously appropriates moneys in fund to authority for purpose of making grants and loans. Appropriates moneys for deposit in fund. Requires, for each dwelling unit rented by landlord for which source of drinking water is well, landlord to collect and test samples of drinking water from dwelling unit for arsenic, total coliform bacteria and nitrates. Becomes operative March 1, 2018.
Title
Relating to ground water that is used for domestic purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. John Lively [D] | Sen. Arnie Roblan [D] | Rep. Paul Evans [D] | Rep. Karin Power [D] |
Sen. Sara Gelser Blouin [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-04-14 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-04-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-04-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-10 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |