OR HB2402 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-22 - Chapter 712, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 20, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-22 - Chapter 712, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 20, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Task Force on Funding for Fish, Wildlife and Related Outdoor Recreation and Education. Establishes Task Force on State Department of Fish and Wildlife Funding] Funding for Fish, Wildlife and Related Outdoor Recreation and Education. Sunsets task force on December 31, 2016. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to State Department of Fish and Wildlife funding; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-22 | House | Chapter 712, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 20, 2015. |
2015-07-20 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-07-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed.Ayes, 24; nays, 4--Boquist, Ferrioli, Thatcher, Whitsett; excused, 2--Olsen, Shields. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-06-26 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Rayfield. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Clem, Weidner. |
2015-06-26 | House | Second reading. |
2015-06-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2015-06-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-06-17 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2015-06-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-06-11 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2015-04-17 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2015-04-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2015-04-16 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |