OR HB2400 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that victim of sexual assault or domestic violence crime has right to obtain law enforcement records relating to crime. Provides that victim of sexual assault or domestic violence crime has right to obtain law enforcement records relating to crime. Requires law enforcement agencies to provide copy of reports and records of child abuse and neglect investigation to victim, or victim's attorney, upon request. Requires district attorney in any criminal prosecution to make available to victim, upon request, all discovery that was disclosed to defendant.
Title
Relating to victim access to records.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2400 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2400/Introduced |