OR HB2400 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Chapter 400, (2019 Laws): Effective date June 17, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Chapter 400, (2019 Laws): Effective date June 17, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extends deadline to appeal mental illness determination under certain circumstances. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to mental illness determinations; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-21 | House | Chapter 400, (2019 Laws): Effective date June 17, 2019. |
2019-06-17 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-05 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 60. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Thatcher. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 1--Taylor. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Carried over to 06-03 by unanimous consent. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Motion to rerefer to Judiciary carried by unanimous consent. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-03-06 | House | Third reading. Carried by McLane. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--Meek, Smith G; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Rayfield. |
2019-03-05 | House | Second reading. |
2019-03-04 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-02-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |