OR HB2400 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Chapter 74, (2017 Laws): Effective date October 6, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Chapter 74, (2017 Laws): Effective date October 6, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes any state agency or department to enter into agreements with any political subdivision for collection, enforcement, administration and distribution of local transient lodging taxes of such political subdivision. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to the administration of local transient lodging taxes; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Nancy Nathanson [D] | Rep. Caddy McKeown [D] | Rep. Philip Barnhart [D] | Rep. Robert Nosse [D] |
Rep. Karin Power [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | House | Chapter 74, (2017 Laws): Effective date October 6, 2017. |
2017-05-17 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Boquist. Passed.Ayes, 28; nays, 2--Linthicum, Olsen. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-04-14 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-04-10 | House | Third reading. Carried by Marsh. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Boone, Piluso. |
2017-04-06 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-04-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-02-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |