OR HB2395 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 193, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 193, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires manufacturer to equip connected device with reasonable security features that protect connected device and information that connected device stores from access, destruction, modification, use or disclosure that consumer does not authorize. Requires person that manufactures, sells or offers to sell connected device] manufacturer to equip connected device with reasonable security features that protect connected device and information that connected device collects, contains, stores or transmits] stores from access, destruction, modification, use or disclosure that consumer does not authorize. Specifies what may constitute reasonable security features. Specifies exemptions and exclusions from requirement. Punishes violation as unlawful trade practice under Unlawful Trade Practices Act.
Title
Relating to security measures required for devices that connect to the Internet.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | House | Chapter 193, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-05-30 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 19; Nays, 9--Baertschiger Jr, Beyer, Boquist, Girod, Heard, Johnson, Linthicum, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Carried over to 05-22 by unanimous consent. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-16 | House | Third reading. Carried by Williamson. Passed. Ayes, 53; Nays, 5--Findley, Nearman, Post, Reschke, Smith DB; Excused, 1--Barreto; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2019-04-15 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-11 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-04-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-19 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |