OR HB2387 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Public Hearing held.
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies CASA Volunteer Programs to direct Oregon Department of Administrative Services to contract with nongovernmental entity to serve as statewide coordinating entity for provision of court appointed special advocate services. Modifies CASA Volunteer Programs to direct Oregon Department of Administrative Services to contract with nongovernmental entity to serve as statewide coordinating entity for provision of court appointed special advocate services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to CASA Volunteer Programs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-05HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-02-08HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Human Services.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback