OR HB2383 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys for distribution to Curry County assessor for pilot program to increase employment in assessor's office in order to achieve assessment rotation of seven years for taxable property. Requires county to have available matching amount for each year of distribution. Requires assessor to withhold or collect matching moneys from taxing districts within county other than education districts. Requires Department of Revenue to submit report reviewing experience of pilot program to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to revenue on or before September 15, 2021. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to an appropriation for a tax assessment pilot program; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. David Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-11 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-27 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Economic Development with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |