OR HB2381 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires State Department of Fish and Wildlife to operate program in southwest Oregon to control populations of species that prey on salmon.
Title
Relating to the protection of salmon.
Sponsors
Sen. David Smith [R] | Sen. Dallas Heard [R] | Rep. Gary Leif [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-21 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Natural Resources with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB2381 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2381/Introduced |