OR HB2375 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for restoration of retirement credit for member of Oregon Public Service Retirement Plan who forfeited retirement credit due to lack of service at end of 2020. Provides for restoration of retirement credit for member of Oregon Public Service Retirement Plan who forfeited retirement credit due to lack of service at end of 2020. Provides that member forfeits retirement credit on December 31, 2021, if member performs fewer than 600 hours of service in 2021. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the forfeiture of retirement credit under the Oregon Public Service Retirement Plan; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-22 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2375 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2375/Introduced |