OR HB2374 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 153, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 03, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 153, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 03, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires state contracting agency that awards certain types of public contracts to report number of procurements state contracting agency solicited, general nature of each procurement and estimate of contract price, which contract preferences set forth in statute or administrative rule state contracting agency applied in evaluating bids or proposals for procurement and why state contracting agency applied or did not apply contract preferences. Directs Oregon Department of Administrative Services to study issues related to preferences in public contracting and report to appropriate committee or interim committee of Legislative Assembly on or before September 15, 2022.] Requires state contracting agency that awards certain types of public contracts to report number of procurements state contracting agency solicited, general nature of each procurement and estimate of contract price, which contract preferences set forth in statute or administrative rule state contracting agency applied in evaluating bids or proposals for procurement and why state contracting agency applied or did not apply contract preferences. Requires Oregon Department of Administrative Services to develop and make available training materials and procedures for applying contracting preferences. Directs department to submit report to interim committee of Legislative Assembly that summarizes information from state contracting agencies and includes recommendations to ensure that state contracting agencies apply contract preferences in accordance with intent of Legislative Assembly. Sunsets January 2, 2023. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to preferences in public contracting; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 153, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 03, 2021. |
2021-06-03 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Riley. Passed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 4--Girod, Heard, Linthicum, Thomsen; Excused, 5--Anderson, Findley, Hansell, President Courtney, Thatcher. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Labor and Business. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-15 | House | Third reading. Carried by Nathanson. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Breese-Iverson, Drazan, Levy. |
2021-04-14 | House | Carried over to April 15, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-13 | House | Carried over to April 14, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-12 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 13, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 12, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-08 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-04-05 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-29 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |