OR HB2374 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows credit against net income taxes for portion of eligible costs of newly constructed single-family dwelling that sells for price affordable to household with annual income at or below 120 percent of area median income. Sunsets on January 2, 2029. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to tax incentives for affordable housing; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. David Smith [R] | Sen. Arnie Roblan [D] | Sen. Dallas Heard [R] | Rep. Gary Leif [R] |
Rep. Ronald Noble [R] | Rep. Carl Wilson [R] | Sen. Elizabeth Johnson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB2374 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2374/Introduced |