OR HB2373 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
Pending: Joint Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amends apprenticeship statutes to permit establishment of firefighter apprentice program. Amends apprenticeship statutes to permit establishment of firefighter apprentice program. Appropriates money to Bureau of Labor and Industries for purpose of establishing firefighter apprentice program. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to firefighter training; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-31 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-05HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2021-04-05HouseRecommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2021-03-31HouseWork Session held.
2021-03-01HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Business and Labor with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback