OR HB2372 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Oregon Industrial Hemp Commission. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to cannabis; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Carl Wilson [R] | Sen. David Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-04-19 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-04-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-04-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |