OR HB2371 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Oregon Youth Authority to study juveniles. Requires Oregon Youth Authority to study juveniles. Directs authority to submit findings to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to judiciary not later than September 15, 2024.
Title
Relating to juveniles.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-04-12 | House | Referred to Rules by order of Speaker. |
2023-04-12 | House | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules. |
2023-04-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-01-11 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |