OR HB2370 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Higher Education Coordinating Commission to conduct needs assessment identifying current mental health provider education programs and curricula offered at community colleges and public universities. Directs Higher Education Coordinating Commission to conduct needs assessment identifying current mental health provider education programs and curricula offered at community colleges and public universities. Sunsets January 2, 2023. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to mental health provider education; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Zach Hudson [D] | Rep. Andrea Salinas [D] | Rep. Courtney Neron [D] | Rep. Teresa Alonso Leon [D] |
Rep. Janelle Bynum [D] | Rep. Lisa Reynolds [D] | Rep. Tawna Sanchez [D] | Sen. Janeen Sollman [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-08 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Education (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-02-09 | House | Referred to Education by order of Speaker. |
2021-02-09 | House | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Education. |
2021-02-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Behavioral Health. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |