OR HB2369 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Education to develop statewide mental and behavioral health care plan for students. Directs Department of Education to develop statewide mental and behavioral health care plan for students. Sunsets December 31, 2026. Directs recipients of grants from Fund for Student Success to provide trauma-informed mental health care when meeting students' mental and behavioral health needs. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to student mental health; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Zach Hudson [D] | Rep. Courtney Neron [D] | Rep. Lisa Reynolds [D] | Rep. Ricki Ruiz [D] |
Rep. Andrea Salinas [D] | Rep. Tawna Sanchez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Education. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2369 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2369/Introduced |