OR HB2368 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes pilot program to promote and support positive student mental and behavioral health by using trauma-informed approaches that are culturally responsive. Establishes pilot program to improve educational outcomes by using trauma-informed approaches to education, health services and intervention strategies] promote and support positive student mental and behavioral health by using trauma-informed approaches that are culturally responsive. Requires report on preliminary evaluation of] progress of pilot program. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2021.
Title
Relating to pilot program for trauma-informed approaches; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Zach Hudson [D] | Rep. Courtney Neron [D] | Rep. Karin Power [D] | Rep. Lisa Reynolds [D] |
Rep. Ricki Ruiz [D] | Rep. Andrea Salinas [D] | Rep. Tawna Sanchez [D] | Sen. Janeen Sollman [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-04-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-03-30 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-16 | House | Public Hearing cancelled. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |