OR HB2365 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys to State Forestry Department for 2019-2021 biennium to carry out integrated pest management program to combat Sudden Oak Death. Requires department to expend part of appropriation as grant for task force to encourage and coordinate county integrated pest management programs to combat Sudden Oak Death. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019. .
Title
Relating to Sudden Oak Death; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. David Smith [R] | Sen. Arnie Roblan [D] | Rep. Caddy McKeown [D] | Rep. David Gomberg [D] |
Rep. Gary Leif [R] | Sen. Dallas Heard [R] | Sen. Elizabeth Johnson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-03-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-03-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Natural Resources with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |