OR HB2362 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 615, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires approval from Department of Consumer and Business Services or Oregon Health Authority before any mergers, acquisitions, contracts or affiliations of health care entities and other entities if entities meet or exceed specified thresholds in average net patient revenue or in gross amount of premiums in preceding three fiscal years . Requires approval from Department of Consumer and Business Services or Oregon Health Authority before any mergers, acquisitions, contracts or affiliations of health care entities and other entities if entities had $25 million or more] meet or exceed specified thresholds in average net patient revenue or in gross amount of premiums in preceding three fiscal years or net patient revenue of $10 million or more]. Specifies exceptions and procedures. Requires Oregon Health Policy Board to establish criteria for approval by authority of mergers, acquisitions and affiliations based on specified factors. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.].

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to health care providers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-25HouseChapter 615, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
2021-07-27HouseGovernor signed.
2021-06-30SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-29HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-26SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed. Ayes, 16; Nays, 12--Anderson, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Johnson, Kennemer, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Heard, Manning Jr.
2021-06-26SenateSecond reading.
2021-06-26SenateRecommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
2021-06-25SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2021-06-25SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2021-06-25HouseThird reading. Carried by Salinas. Passed. Ayes, 32; Nays, 23--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Evans, Leif, Levy, Lewis, Lively, Moore-Green, Morgan, Noble, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Witt, Wright, Zika; Excused, 4--Dexter, Hayden, Smith G, Wilde.
2021-06-24HouseSecond reading.
2021-06-23HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2021-06-21HouseWork Session held.
2021-06-18HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2021-06-18HouseWork Session held.
2021-06-17HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
2021-04-15HouseReferred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
2021-04-15HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
2021-04-08HouseWork Session held.
2021-04-06HouseWork Session held.
2021-02-09HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Health Care.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2362
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2362/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2362/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2362/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2362/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2362/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2362/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/31925
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/33099
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=533935
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=534653

Bill Comments 750

feedback