OR HB2361 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires State Fish and Wildlife Commission to establish and prescribe fees for multiyear resident and nonresident hunting licenses. Sets agent fee for issuance of each multiyear license at $5. Becomes operative January 1, 2022.
Title
Relating to hunting.
Sponsors
Sen. David Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-08 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-26 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Natural Resources with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |