OR HB2360 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 96, (2021 Laws): Effective date May 26, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 96, (2021 Laws): Effective date May 26, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits nonprofit hospital from requiring patient to apply for medical assistance before screening for or providing financial assistance. Prohibits nonprofit hospital from requiring patient to apply for medical assistance before screening for or providing financial assistance. Adjusts series reference. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to health care; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Rules suspended (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Rules suspended (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 96, (2021 Laws): Effective date May 26, 2021. |
2021-05-26 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-19 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Jama. Passed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 6--Anderson, Findley, Girod, Heard, Linthicum, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Gelser, Thatcher. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-08 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Campos. Passed. Ayes, 54; Nays, 1--Nearman; Excused, 5--Alonso Leon, Bynum, Clem, Smith G, Speaker Kotek. |
2021-04-08 | House | Motion to suspend the rules passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 5--Alonso Leon, Bynum, Clem, Smith G, Speaker Kotek.. Ayes, 55; Excused, 5--Alonso Leon, Bynum, Clem, Smith G, Speaker Kotek. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-06 | House | Carried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-05 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-03-31 | House | Carried over to April 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over to March 31, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-29 | House | Carried over to March 30, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-24 | House | Carried over to March 29, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-22 | House | Second reading. |
2021-03-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-03-09 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-02 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |