OR HB2360 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Task Force on Use of Surplus Public Lands for Housing. Requires task force to report findings and recommendations to interim committee related to housing on or before December 31, 2019. Sunsets task force December 31, 2020. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to use of surplus public lands; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. David Smith [R] | Rep. Cheri Helt [R] | Rep. Joseph Zika [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |