OR HB2359 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 453, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 14, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 453, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 14, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires health care providers to work with health care interpreters from health care interpreter registry operated by Oregon Health Authority to provide interpretation services. Requires health care providers to work with health care interpreters from health care interpreter registry operated by Oregon Health Authority to provide interpretation services. Requires health professional regulatory boards, Department of Human Services and authority to adopt rules to enforce requirement. Provides exceptions. Requires interpretation service companies to only employ or contract with health care interpreters listed on health care registry, subject to exceptions. Requires Oregon Council on Health Care Interpreters to develop and approve standards for testing, qualification and certification of certain health care interpreters. Requires authority to train and certify or qualify health care interpreters and maintain central registry of certified or qualified health care interpreters. Requires coordinated care organizations to work with health care interpreters listed on health care interpreter registry. Makes certain health care interpreters subject workers for purposes of workers' compensation benefits. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to health care interpreters; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-11 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-11 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 453, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 14, 2021. |
2021-07-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 8--Boquist, Findley, Girod, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Manning Jr. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-06-17 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Salinas. Passed. Ayes, 50; Nays, 9--Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Hayden, Levy, Moore-Green, Post, Reschke, Wallan. |
2021-06-17 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2021-06-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-08 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-03 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2021-04-19 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2021-04-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-04-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-02 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |