OR HB2358 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits employers from permitting, requiring or suffering agricultural workers to work in excess of certain maximum hours in one workweek unless workers are compensated for overtime hours worked. Prohibits employers from permitting, or] requiring or suffering agricultural workers to work in excess of 40] certain maximum hours in one workweek unless workers are compensated for overtime hours worked. Phases in requirement over three calendar years. Authorizes Commissioner of Bureau of Labor and Industries to enforce wage claim regarding overtime pay for agricultural workers. Authorizes commissioner to assess civil penalty for willful violations of overtime pay requirements. Requires Oregon Business Development Department to develop and implement overtime compensation payment program to assist employers of agricultural workers in paying required overtime to workers. Establishes Agricultural Worker Overtime Account. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to department for deposit into account to carry out purposes of program. Sunsets program on January 2, 2026.
Title
Relating to overtime.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-16 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-06-18 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2021-06-18 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-16 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules by order of Speaker. |
2021-04-15 | House | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules. |
2021-04-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-29 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |