OR HB2358 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides grants to counties that received Secure Rural Schools Program payments in calendar year 2008 equal to at least 30 percent of all moneys deposited into county general fund. Authorizes grants for projects to consolidate or share services among county and cities and special districts within county, in amount not to exceed $150,000 per project. Establishes Oregon County Assistance Fund. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Oregon County Assistance Fund for purpose of making grants. Sunsets July 1, 2027. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to state grants to assist certain counties; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage, rescind subsequent referral to Student Success, and be referred to Rules (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to Rules by order of Speaker. |
2019-03-14 | House | Subsequent referral to Student Success rescinded by order of the Speaker. |
2019-03-14 | House | Without recommendation as to passage, subsequent referral to Student Success be rescinded, and be referred to Rules. |
2019-03-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-20 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Student Success. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |