OR HB2355 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Oregon Business Development Department to develop matching grant program to fund new positions in tribal governments to increase tribal capacity for economic development activities. Requires Oregon Business Development Department to develop matching grant program to fund new positions in tribal governments to increase tribal capacity for economic development activities. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to tribal economic development; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Bonham [R] | Rep. Tawna Sanchez [D] | Rep. Paul Evans [D] | Rep. Bobby Levy [R] |
Sen. Bill Hansell [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-03-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-03-16 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Economic Recovery and Prosperity with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |