OR HB2354 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits physician or clinical laboratory from delivering claim, bill or other demand for payment for anatomic pathology services other than to patient, insurer or third-party payer, public health clinic or nonprofit health clinic or government agency responsible for paying for patient's medical care or anatomic pathology services. Prohibits physician or clinical laboratory from delivering claim, bill or other demand for payment for anatomic pathology services other than to patient, insurer or third-party payer, public health clinic or nonprofit health clinic or government agency responsible for paying for patient's medical care or anatomic pathology services. Becomes operative on January 1, 2022. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to billing for anatomic pathology services; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2354 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2354/Introduced |